MA H3852 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electrical load aggregation programs. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Supporting electrical load aggregation programs in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4500 |
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S367 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4427 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4500 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4521 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
S367 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4427 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4500 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4521 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3852.pdf |