MA H3829 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-04 - Sections returned with veto (see section 2, item 4000-0600; and sections 17 and 46) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-04 - Sections returned with veto (see section 2, item 4000-0600; and sections 17 and 46) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2015 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2015 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-04 | House | Sections returned with veto (see section 2, item 4000-0600; and sections 17 and 46) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-04 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3837 for section 77 |
2015-11-04 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3836 for section 63 |
2015-11-04 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3835 for section 10 |
2015-11-04 | House | For message, see H3838 |
2015-11-02 | Governor returned to the House with vetoes and amendments to certain sections | |
2015-11-02 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-10-28 | House | Enacted |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-10-28 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-28 | House | Passed to be engrossed 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 168) |
2015-10-28 | House | Read third |
2015-10-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported on a part of H3676 |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3838 (Replaced by) 2015-11-04 - See H3829
H3835 (Replaced by) 2015-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2015
H3836 (Replaced by) 2015-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2015
H3837 (Replaced by) 2015-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H3835 (Replaced by) 2015-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2015
H3836 (Replaced by) 2015-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2015
H3837 (Replaced by) 2015-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3829 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3829.pdf |