MA H3820 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the acquisition of ground water in said town by the Water Supply District of Acton. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Restricting the ability of the water supply district of Acton to acquire ground water sources in the town of Boxborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-16 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-16 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-11-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-10-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2011-10-17 | House | Returned by the State Secretary with letter |
2011-08-25 | House | Transmitted to the State Secretary |
2011-08-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2011-07-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3820 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17146&generalCourtId=1 |