MA H3798 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create direct dental care agreements. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create direct dental care agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-05-20SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H602 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S667 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1349 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3806 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback