MA H3793 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to voluntarily issue driver's licenses and special identification card designations to persons with intellectual disabilities or autism spectrum disorder. Transportation.
Title
Relative to proactively protecting automotive drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2016 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2015-08-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3793 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3793.pdf |