MA H3791 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Shannon Griffin, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Shannon Griffin, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-10-26 | House | Enacted |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-10-26 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3791.pdf |