MA H3788 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3772
Note: Replaces legislation S1981
Note: Replaces legislation S1981
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to election laws House bill No. 3772, as changed by the
Title
Relative to election laws
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-19 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-19 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #302 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee of conference report accepted 147 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 369) |
2014-05-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-05-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-12 | House | For report, see H4072 |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported by committee of conference |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Finegold-DiDomenico-Hedlund), in concurrence |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee of conference appointed (J. Murphy-M. Moran-Dooley) |
2014-01-27 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-01-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #238 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 1] |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S1981 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read third |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S1975, amended |
2014-01-16 | Senate | For Senate actions, see S1975 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1975 |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-11-27 | House | H3772, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3772 (Replaces) 2013-11-27 - Published as amended, see H3788
S1981 (Replaces) 2014-01-16 - See H3788
S1981 (Replaces) 2014-01-16 - See H3788
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3788 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3788.pdf |