MA H3783 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the requirement of residential property owners to purchase or pay for flood insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to flood insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see H4255 |
2014-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #372 [Yeas 34 - Nays 3] |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2229 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2229 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-03-12 | House | Passed to be engrossed 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 301) |
2014-03-12 | House | Amendment adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Read third |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-11-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3783 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3783.pdf |