MA H3761 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Bolton be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Bolton to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-03-21 | House | Enacted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-01-28 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3761 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3761.pdf |