MA H3736 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the inspections of exercise equipment in health clubs. Public Health.
Title
Providing for inspections of exercise equipment in health clubs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-08-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H832 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2729 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2866 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1699 (Similar To) 2015-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3765
H2864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H832 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2729 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2866 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1699 (Similar To) 2015-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3765
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3736 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3736.pdf |