MA H3735 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Elugardo of Boston, a petition of Nika C. Elugardo and others for the annual issuance of a proclamation by the Governor setting apart the month of September as polycystic ovary syndrome awareness month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating September as PCOS awareness month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-09-15 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-01-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3735.pdf |