MA H3729 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the child custody jurisdiction and enforcement. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2500 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-01-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2500 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2500 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3729 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3729.pdf |