MA H3728 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of the town of Townsend. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Approving the Townsend special act charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2752 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-09-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-08-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-08-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-08-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H4847 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5004 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4847 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5004 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3728 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3728.pdf |