MA H3709 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exams of the Board of Registration of Cosmetology and Barbering. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the Board of Registration of Cosmetology and Barbering exams
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3709 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3709.pdf |