MA H3707 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to applications for certificates of title at the Registry of Motor Vehicles for surviving spouses and next of kin of deceased persons. Transportation.
Title
Relative to simplifying processes at the Registry of Motor Vehicles for surviving spouses and next of kin
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S941 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4833
S2224 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2632
H3368 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2023-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2224 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2632
H3368 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2023-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3707.pdf |