MA H3368 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to gender identity on certain identification issued by the Registry of Motor Vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2023-07-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2207 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2425
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3368.pdf |