MA H3680 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the listing on utility bill of discounts available to seniors, veterans or persons with disabilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to utility bills

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-08HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1915 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2656
H2947 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1222 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1065 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback