MA H1222 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an electronic system of public reporting for providers as a prerequisite condition for advancing overdue medical bills to debt collection agencies. Health Care Financing.
Title
To ensure uniform and transparent reporting of medical debt data
Sponsors
Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied by S743 |
2023-08-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S743 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1222 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1222.pdf |