MA H368 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-17)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a citizens' initiative review commission. Election Laws.
Title
To create a citizens' initiative review commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-09 | House | Accompanied by S390 |
2017-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S390 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied H368
S284 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S326 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H2040 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2149 (Similar To) -
S284 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S326 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H2040 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2149 (Similar To) -
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H368.pdf |