MA H2153 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reorganize the Farm Technology Review Commission. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Farm Technology Review Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-11-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H68 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
H3731 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2017
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731
H3731 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2017
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2153.pdf |