MA S284 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement the recommendations of the Chapter 70 foundation budget review commission. Education.
Title
To implement the recommendations of the Chapter 70 foundation budget review commission
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Michael Day [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2325 |
2017-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H812 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H900 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2040 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4012 (Similar To) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2325 (Replaced by) 2018-05-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H900 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2040 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4012 (Similar To) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2325 (Replaced by) 2018-05-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S284 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S284.pdf |