MA H3663 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax deductions for retirement account contributions. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax deductions for retirement account contributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1681 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2553 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1656 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2499 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1649 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2553 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1656 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2499 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1649 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3663 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3663.pdf |