MA H3662 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to veterans and public housing rent. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to veterans and public housing rent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3656 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3662 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3662.pdf |