MA H3657 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the sharing of certain police reports by investigators of the Department of Children and Families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To improve child safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-12-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
S950 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S29 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S950 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S29 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3657.pdf |