MA H3656 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the Town of Belmont to grant licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises By Mr. Rogers of Cambridge, a petition of David M. Rogers and William N. Brownsberger (by vote of the town) that the town of Belmont be authorized to issue additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages and wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Belmont to grant licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-01-21 | House | Enacted |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-12-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-12-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-12-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-12-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2013 from 04:00 PM-04:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3656 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3656.pdf |