MA H3654 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act directing the Somerville Retirement Board to retire Mario Oliveira, a police officer of the city of Somerville By Representative Provost of Somerville and Senator Jehlen, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Denise Provost and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Somerville be authorized to retire Mario Oliveira, a police officer of said city. Public Service.
Title
Directing the Somerville Retirement Board to retire Mario Oliveira, a police officer of the city of Somerville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-12-09 | House | Enacted |
2013-12-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-12-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Read third and paassed to be engrossed |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Amended (Jehlen-Donnelly) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S1949 |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Read second |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-11-21 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-09-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3654 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3654.pdf |