MA H3650 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5070
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment preference for veterans at the Massachusetts Port Authority. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To enhance opportunities for veterans at the Massachusetts Port Authority
Sponsors
Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5070 |
2021-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5070 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5070 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3650.pdf |