MA H3649 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to teachers' retirement funds. Public Service.
Title
Involving teachers retirement funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4518 |
2023-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1648 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
H17 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3977 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2577 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
H17 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3977 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2577 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3649 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3649.pdf |