MA H361 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve Title: Resolve establishing a special commission on school safety By Mr. Chan of Quincy, a petition of Tackey Chan for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to evaluate school safety based on current events and best methods to use modern communications and building safety methods. Education.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission on school safety
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4487 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 24, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 27, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4487 (Replaced by) 2014-09-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H361 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H361.pdf |