MA H3604 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits provided to Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority employees. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3604.pdf |