MA H3599 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain rental car fees. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Prohibiting certain fees connected to rental cars
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S553 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S553 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3599.pdf |