MA H3585 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Provincetown be authorized to establish residency requirements for certain employees of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Provincetown to change the residency requirement for certain officials
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-09-10 | House | Enacted |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Order of the Day |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-08-27 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3585 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3585.pdf |