MA H3571 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating a commercial driver’s license pilot program to be administered by Madison Park Technical Vocational High School in the city of Boston. Education.
Title
Relative to creating a commercial driver’s license pilot program at Madison Park Technical Vocational High School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4583 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S319 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2616
H4583 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4583 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3571 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3571.pdf |