MA H3570 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for hospital or ambulatory center charges for certain dental procedures requiring general anesthesia. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to dental anesthesia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-11-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
H536 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H551 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H579 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H572 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H536 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H551 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H579 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H572 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3570 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3570.pdf |