MA H3566 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating the posting of speed limits. Transportation.
Title
Regulating the posting of speed limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4944 |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
H3750 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2678 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H1191 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1734 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S408 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3750 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2678 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H1191 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1734 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S408 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3566 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3566.pdf |