MA S408 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulating the Assisted Living Advisory Council. Elder Affairs.
Title
Further regulating the Assisted Living Advisory Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2912 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H742 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
H728 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
H2221 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S409 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2656
S426 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S420 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S563 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4595
H742 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
H728 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
H2221 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S409 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2656
S426 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S420 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S563 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4595
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S408 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S408.pdf |