MA H3552 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 201 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 201 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the position of deputy chief of police in the town of Natick from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the position of deputy chief of police in the town of Natick from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 201 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-29 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3552 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3552.pdf |