MA H3549 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3577
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish standardized analysis tools to be used to report crashes and incidents involving cyclists, other vulnerable users or pedestrians. Transportation.
Title
To reduce traffic fatalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | New draft substituted, see H5103 |
2022-07-28 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5103 |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-02-24 | House | Accompanied by H3577 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2273 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2636
H3577 (Replaces) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3549
H5103 (Replaced by) 2022-09-12 - House concurred in the Senate still further amendments
H3577 (Replaces) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3549
H5103 (Replaced by) 2022-09-12 - House concurred in the Senate still further amendments
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3549.pdf |