MA H3539 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. McMurtry of Dedham, a petition of Paul McMurtry that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to make driving records available online for informational purposes. Transportation.
Title
Promoting personal access of driving records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3551 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5258
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3551 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5258
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3539 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3539.pdf |