MA H3532 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the use of biological and botanical pesticide products that are considered appropriate for organic farming on hemp and marijuana. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to organic farming tools
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Leicester Public Library |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2067 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3518 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S978 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2067 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3518 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S978 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3532 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3532.pdf |