MA H3525 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to community outreach procedure for retail marijuana establishment license applicants. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to community outreach procedure for retail marijuana establishment license applicants
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Leicester Public Library |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3525 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3525.pdf |