MA H3498 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3603
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Accompanied H3603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Accompanied H3603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to antique motor vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to antique motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | House | Accompanied H3603 |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3603 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H3040 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3603 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H3040 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3498 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3498.pdf |