MA H3456 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to eviction proceedings and the creation of a public task force to develop a right to counsel in said proceedings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure right to counsel in eviction proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1358 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback