MA H3456 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Somerville to use Harris Park for purposes other than a park or a playground. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the relocation of Harris Park in the City of Somerville
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-07-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-06-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3456 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16114&generalCourtId=1 |