MA H3448 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting commercial driver safety. Transportation.
Title
To promote commercial driver safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1773 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3448 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3448.pdf |