MA H1773 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to penalties for persons confined to correctional facilities who commit assault or assault and battery by means of dangerous weapons upon officers, other employees, volunteers or employees of contractors. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote correctional personnel safety
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] |
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4002 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1773.pdf |