MA H3445 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the motor carrier safety council to improve the transportation of hazardous and non-hazardous products. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the creation of a motor carrier safety council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3445.pdf |