MA H3436 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting certain antique cars from the annual vehicle safety inspection program. Transportation.
Title
Relative to antique motor vehicle inspections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3343 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2293 (Similar To) 2023-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2413 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2293 (Similar To) 2023-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2413 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3436.pdf |