MA H3343 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting certain antique cars from the annual vehicle safety inspection program. Transportation.
Title
Relative to vehicle inspection exemptions for vintage automobiles 45 years or older
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-02-05 | House | Accompanied by H3436 |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3436 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied H3343
H4544 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4544 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3343 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3343.pdf |