MA H3410 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electric foot scooter operating requirements. Transportation.
Title
Relative to electric foot scooter operating requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
Sen. John Cronin [D] | Rep. William Driscoll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2244 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2644
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3410 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3410.pdf |